Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467928

EP3467928 - NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Central Glass Co., Ltd.
5253, Oaza Okiube
Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ITABASHI, Saori
c/o CENTRAL GLASS CO. LTD.
Chemical Research Center
17-5 Nakadai 2-chome
Kawagoe City Saitama 350-1159 / JP
02 / SUZUKI, Katsutoshi
c/o CENTRAL GLASS CO. LTD.
Chemical Research Center
17-5 Nakadai 2-chome
Kawagoe City Saitama 350-1159 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI, Mikihiro
c/o CENTRAL GLASS CO. LTD.
Chemical Research Center (Ube)
5253 Oaza-Okiube
Ube City Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP
04 / TAKEDA, Kazunari
c/o CENTRAL GLASS CO. LTD.
7-1 Kanda-Nishikicho 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806501.724.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP19434
Priority number, dateJP2016010691130.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016106911
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017208944
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467928
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/0567, H01M10/0525, // H01M2/16, H01M4/38, H01M4/485, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M4/58, H01M4/587, H01M10/0568
[2019/26]
Former International [2019/15]H01M10/0567, H01M2/16, H01M4/38, H01M4/46, H01M4/48, H01M4/485, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M4/58, H01M4/587, H01M10/052, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569, C07C55/07, C07F1/02, C07F7/08, C07F7/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:WASSERFREIE ELEKTROLYTLÖSUNG UND BATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT[2019/15]
English:NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY USING SAME[2019/15]
French:SOLUTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON AQUEUSE ET BATTERIE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX UTILISANT À CELLE-CI[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018Translation filed 
06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Search fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2016035820  (Central Glass Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-20 * , claims; examples & WO 2016/017404 A1 & EP 3166170 A1 claims; examples & KR 10-2017-0033437 A *;
 [A]US2014342243  (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.) [A] 1-20 * , claims; examples & KR 10-2014-0134953 A *;
 [PX]WO2017026181  (Central Glass Co., Ltd.) [PX] 1-20 * , claims; examples & JP 2017-37808 A *;
 [PX]WO2016117279  (Central Glass Co., Ltd.) [PX] 1-20 * , claims; examples & JP 2016-139605 A & TW 201640732 A *;
 [PX]WO2016117280  (Central Glass Co., Ltd.) [PX] 1-20 * , claims; examples & JP 2016-136498 A & TW 201640733 A *
by applicantJPH0845545
 JP2001006729
 JP2002110235
 JP2013051122
 JP2013030465
 JP2011022193
 JP2003505464
 JP4695802B
 JP2003137890
 WO2014034043
 JP2002151077
 JP2009137834
 US7135252
 JP2008270201
 WO2013118661
 JP2013030284
 WO2004100293
 JP2008016424
 WO2004042851
 WO2007083155
 JP2007018883
 JP2009176752
    - J. Chem. Soc.(A, (19700000), vol. 15, pages 2569 - 2574