Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466918

EP3466918 - POLYMERIZABLE POLAR COMPOUND, LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION, AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JNC Corporation
2-1, Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8105 / JP
For all designated states
JNC Petrochemical Corporation
2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0004 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / YANO, Masakazu
c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION
ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER
5-1 Goikaigan
Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP
02 / KONDOU, Fumitaka
c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION
ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER
5-1 Goikaigan
Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP
03 / OGITA, Kazuhiro
c/o JNC PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION
ICHIHARA RESEARCH CENTER
5-1 Goikaigan
Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-8551 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Becker, Eberhard
Patentanwälte
Becker Kurig Straus
Bavariastraße 7
80336 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806713.831.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20186
Priority number, dateJP2016011192803.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016111928
JP2016021089327.10.2016         Original published format: JP 2016210893
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209161
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466918
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07C69/54, C07C69/732, C09K19/12, C09K19/14, C09K19/18, C09K19/20, C09K19/30, C09K19/32, C09K19/34, C09K19/42, C09K19/54, C09K19/56, G02F1/13, G02F1/1337
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:POLYMERISIERBARE POLARE VERBINDUNG, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEELEMENT[2019/15]
English:POLYMERIZABLE POLAR COMPOUND, LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION, AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY ELEMENT[2019/15]
French:COMPOSÉ POLAIRE POLYMÉRISABLE, COMPOSITION DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES, ET ÉLÉMENT D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018Translation filed 
19.12.2018National basic fee paid 
19.12.2018Search fee paid 
19.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
12.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XE]WO2017128472  (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT [CN]) [XE] 1-21 * , claims 2, 4 (Family: none) *;
 [XP]WO2016136533  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [XP] 1-21 * , page 136, compounds 1 to 10 (Family: none) *;
 [X]CN105061213  (JIANGSU HECHENG ADVANCED MATERIALS CO LTD) [X] 1-7, 12, 21 * , claims 1 to 10 (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2011213996  (NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-7 * , claim 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]US2014139786  (ENGEL MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * , claims 1 to 28 & JP 2016-505669 A & WO 2014/090362 A1 & EP 2931836 A1 *
 [X]  - ACIKSES, ASLISAH et al., "Synthesis, characterization, and thermodynamic properties of poly(3-mesityl-2-hydroxypropyl methacrylate", Journal of Applied Polymer Science, (20060700), vol. 101, no. 1, pages 101 - 109, XP055557952 [X] 1-7 * , page 104, scheme 1, compound 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.23345
 [X]  - BOHLMANN, FERDINAND et al., "Eremophilane derivatives and other constituents from Senecio species", Phytochemistry, (19850000), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1249 - 1261, XP055557958 [X] 1-7 * Page 1255, compound 38, page 1261, compound 38 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)81111-5
by applicantWO2014090362
 WO2014094959
 WO2013004372
 WO2012104008
 WO2012038026
 JPS5035076
    - Organic Syntheses, ohn Wiley & Sons, Inc.
    - Organic Reactions, John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
    - Comprehensive Organic Synthesis, Pergamon Press
    - New Experimental Chemistry Course (Shin Jikken Kagaku Koza in Japanese, Maruzen Co., Ltd.
    - M. IMAI et al., Molecular Crystals and Liquid Crystals, (19950000), vol. 259, page 37
    - Liquid Crystal Device Handbook'' (Ekisho Debaisu Handobukku in Japanese, The Nikkan Kogyo Shimbun, Ltd., page 75
    - Liquid Crystal Device Handbook (Ekisho Debaisu Handobukku in Japanese, Nikkan Kogyo Shimbun, Ltd., page 75