Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466402

EP3466402 - OILY GELATINOUS COMPOSITION AND COSMETIC OR TOPICAL AGENT CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nikko Chemicals Co., Ltd.
1-4-8 Nihonbashi-Bakurocho
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0002 / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Surfactant Industries Co., Ltd.
1-4-8 Nihonbashi-Bakurocho
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0002 / JP
For all designated states
Cosmos Technical Center Co., Ltd.
3-24-3 Hasune
Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-0046 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA Keisuke
c/o Cosmos Technical Center Co. Ltd.
3-24-3 Hasune
Itabashi-ku
Tokyo 174-0046 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806733.631.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20270
Priority number, dateJP2016011179603.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016111796
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209182
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466402
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/55, A61K8/02, A61K8/31, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/41, A61K8/44, A61K9/06, A61K47/06, A61K47/10, A61K47/18, A61K47/24, A61Q1/04, A61Q1/14, A61Q5/12, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/10
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ÖLIGE GELATINEARTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND KOSMETISCHES ODER TOPISCHES MITTEL DAMIT[2019/15]
English:OILY GELATINOUS COMPOSITION AND COSMETIC OR TOPICAL AGENT CONTAINING SAME[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITION GÉLATINEUSE HUILEUSE, ET AGENT COSMÉTIQUE OU TOPIQUE LA CONTENANT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018Translation filed 
22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Search fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS63122775  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , claims; page 4; examples 11, 14 to 17 (Family: none) *;
 [X]JPH11193213  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0008] to [0015], [0029] to [0030], [0034]; examples 1 to 2, 4 to 6 & TW 464504 B *;
 [X]JPS62234540  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-6 * , claims; page 4; examples & US 5362418 A claims; column 5; examples & EP 227012 A1 & KR 10-1995-0003411 B *;
 [X]JPS63225312  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , claims; page 4; examples & US 4868163 A claims; column 3; examples & EP 265702 A2 *;
 [X]JPH04124117  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , example 8 (Family: none) *;
 [X]JPH0648921  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * , example 10 & US 5380455 A *;
 [X]JPH04217612  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-2, 4 * , claims; examples & EP 491472 A2 claims; examples *;
 [A]JP2015189696  (COSMOS TECHNICAL CT KK, et al) [A] 1-6 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015127323  (COSMOS TECHNICAL CT KK, et al) [A] 1-6 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2016088930  (NIKKO CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015127322  (NIKKO CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2013177367  (NIKKO CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * , (Family: none) *