Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467277

EP3467277 - INTERNAL-COMBUSTION-ENGINE FILTER REGENERATION SYSTEM AND INTERNAL-COMBUSTION-ENGINE FILTER REGENERATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.12.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Isuzu Motors Limited
6-26-1, Minami-Oi Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8722 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / OHSUMI Kazuo
c/o Isuzu Advanced Engineering Center LTD
8 Tsuchidana
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 252-0881 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806737.731.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20282
Priority number, dateJP2016011145903.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016111459
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209186
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467277
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/025, F01N3/035, F01N9/00, F01N3/021, F01N3/023
[2019/17]
Former International [2019/15]F01N3/025, F01N3/035
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERBRENNUNGSMOTORFILTERREGENERATIONSSYSTEM UND VERBRENNUNGSMOTORFILTERREGENERATIONSVERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:INTERNAL-COMBUSTION-ENGINE FILTER REGENERATION SYSTEM AND INTERNAL-COMBUSTION-ENGINE FILTER REGENERATION METHOD[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGÉNÉRATION DE FILTRE DE MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018Translation filed 
03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Search fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
22.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102009005733  (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [X]US2011232363  (SCHOEMIG HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0004]; claim 1 *;
 [X]US2015068195  (LAUER PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007]; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US2012053814  (GEORGE SAM [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *
International search[A]WO2013076867  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , claims 1, 6; paragraphs [0031] to [0038], [0042]; all drawings & US 2014/0216017 A1 claims 1, 7; paragraphs [0043] to [0052]; all drawings & EP 2784276 A1 & CN 103987929 A *;
 [A]JP2008274896  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0047] to [0062], [0070] to [0090]; fig. 1 to 7 & US 2008/0276604 A1 paragraphs [0058] to [0073], [0081] to [0101]; fig. 1 to 7 & EP 1990511 A2 & CN 101302952 A *;
 [A]JP2001234732  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-4 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0030] to [0031], [0046]; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2009108809  (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO, et al) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0008] to [0021], [0027] to [0028], [0033] & US 2010/0269490 A1 paragraphs [0013] to [0035], [0044] to [0045], [0052] & WO 2009/057366 A1 & EP 2213853 A1 *;
 [A]JP2015017516  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0028], [0035] to [0039] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2013221419  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-4 * , claims 1 to 5 (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2015200320
 JP2014507592
 JP20160111459