Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466721

EP3466721 - PNEUMATIC TIRE INNER LINER, PNEUMATIC TIRE, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
For all designated states
Kuraray Co., Ltd.
1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi
Okayama 710-0801 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KAYASHIMA Kentaro
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / YOKOKURA Hiroyuki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
03 / SUGIMOTO Toshikazu
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
04 / NONAKA Yasuhiro
c/o KURARAY CO. LTD.
7471 Tamashimaotoshima
Kurashiki-shi Okayama 713-8550 / JP
05 / SUZUKI Makoto
c/o KURARAY CO. LTD.
7471 Tamashimaotoshima
Kurashiki-shi Okayama 713-8550 / JP
06 / HAYASHI Nahoto
c/o KURARAY CO. LTD.
7471 Tamashimaotoshima
Kurashiki-shi Okayama 713-8550 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17806756.731.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20337
Priority number, dateJP2016010954231.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016109542
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209205
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466721
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C5/14, B29D30/30, B29D30/06
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/15]B60C5/14, B29D30/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFENINNENAUSKLEIDUNG, LUFTREIFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LUFTREIFEN[2019/15]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE INNER LINER, PNEUMATIC TIRE, AND PNEUMATIC TIRE PRODUCTION METHOD[2019/15]
French:CALANDRAGE INTÉRIEUR DE PNEUMATIQUE, PNEUMATIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PNEUMATIQUE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase29.11.2018Translation filed 
29.11.2018National basic fee paid 
29.11.2018Search fee paid 
29.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
29.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
08.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP2878457  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraphs [0032] , [0040] , [4145] - [0048]; example -; claim 1; table 1 * [Y] 2,6-10;
 [XY]EP3015263  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,10 * paragraphs [0040] , [0056] , [0057] , [0060]; claims 1,7,8 * [Y] 2,6-10
International search[XY]JP2013057016  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1, 3-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0045], [0047]; examples (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 6-10;
 [Y]JP2013256287  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 2, 6, 8-10 * , paragraph [0043]; drawings & US 2013/0269850 A1 paragraph [0051]; figures & JP 2012-144238 A & WO 2012/086276 A1 & EP 2657044 A1 & CN 103269878 A *;
 [Y]JP2013233850  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 2, 7-10 * , claims; paragraphs [0030], [0032], [0071]; table 2; drawings & US 2015/0217601 A1 claims; paragraphs [0039], [0041], [0083]; table 2; figures & WO 2013/168472 A1 & EP 2848430 A1 & CN 104284784 A *