Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466707

EP3466707 - INKJET RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku
Tokyo 103-8210 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MIZUSHIMA, Ryuma
c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories
1334 Minato
Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
02 / UEDA, Yasufumi
c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories
1334 Minato
Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806799.701.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20448
Priority number, dateJP2016011033401.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016110334
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209249
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466707
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/00, B41J2/01, C09D11/322
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/15]
English:INKJET RECORDING METHOD[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT À JET D'ENCRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018Translation filed 
27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Search fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
27.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2013230638  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0023], [0025], [0133] to [0135], [0160] (Family: none) *;
 [X]JP2016043695  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0011], [0071] to [0074], [0088], [0096] & EP 3192662 A1 paragraphs [0024], [0186] to [0189], [0212], [0229] & WO 2016/027801 A1 & CN 106573485 A & KR 10-2017-0046132 A *;
 [A]JP2015006795  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0040], [0078] & US 2009/0295847 A1 paragraphs [0054], [0099] *;
 [A]JP2007050652  (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-15 * , paragraph [0007] & US 2007/0040882 A1 paragraph [0009] *;
 [A]JP2014043585  (NISSHIN KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-15 * , paragraph [0005] & US 2011/0124801 A1 paragraph [0005] & WO 2010/140647 A1 & EP 2439217 A1 & TW 201111397 A & CN 102421811 A & KR 10-2012-0022856 A *
by applicantJP2014139298
 JP2012172070