Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466883

EP3466883 - SILICON COMPOUND-COATED METAL PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
M. Technique Co., Ltd.
2-16, Technostage 2-chome
Izumi-shi, Osaka 594-1144 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ENOMURA Masakazu
c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd.
2-16 Technostage 2-chome
Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP
02 / HONDA Daisuke
c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd.
2-16 Technostage 2-chome
Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17806806.001.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20494
Priority number, dateJP2016011134602.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016111346
WO2016JP6654203.06.2016         Original published format: PCT/JP2016/066542
WO2016JP8300107.11.2016         Original published format: PCT/JP2016/083001
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209256
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466883
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C01G9/02, C01B13/14, C01G49/06, C09C1/24, C09C3/06
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MIT EINER SILICIUMVERBINDUNG BESCHICHTETE METALLPARTIKEL[2019/15]
English:SILICON COMPOUND-COATED METAL PARTICLES[2019/15]
French:PARTICULES MÉTALLIQUES REVÊTUES D'UN COMPOSÉ DE SILICIUM[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018Translation filed 
20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Search fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS61256705  (BASF AG) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & US 4729785 A & EP 201068 A2 & DE 3516884 A1 *;
 [A]JPS5931004  (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPS60135506  (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2016009926  (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & TW 201610174 A *;
 [A]JP2009082902  (M TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0155310 A1 & WO 2009/008393 A1 & EP 2184109 A1 & CN 101795772 A *;
 [A]WO2013073695  (M TECH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2014/0308158 A1 & EP 2781282 A1 & CN 103945959 A *;
 [A]WO9847476  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & US 6235270 B1 & EP 988853 A1 & JP 2004-115541 A *;
 [A]WO0042112  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & US 6534044 B1 & EP 1167462 A1 & CN 1340086 A & JP 4740458 B2 *;
 [A]WO2016060223  (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & TW 201619259 A *
by applicantJP2008264611
 JP2007088156
 JP2011219869
 WO0042112
 WO2009008393
 JP2009112892
 JP2016111346
 WO2016JP83001