Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466886

EP3466886 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING OXIDE PARTICLES WITH CONTROLLED COLOR CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
M. Technique Co., Ltd.
2-16, Technostage 2-chome
Izumi-shi, Osaka 594-1144 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ENOMURA Masakazu
c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd.
2-16 Technostage 2-chome
Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP
02 / HONDA Daisuke
c/o M. Technique Co. Ltd.
2-16 Technostage 2-chome
Izumi-shi Osaka 594-1144 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17806856.502.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20727
Priority number, dateJP2016011134602.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016111346
WO2016JP6654203.06.2016         Original published format: PCT/JP2016/066542
WO2016JP8300107.11.2016         Original published format: PCT/JP2016/083001
WO2017JP0387602.02.2017         Original published format: PCT/JP2017/003876
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209306
Date:07.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466886
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:C01G9/02, C01B13/14, C01G49/06, C09C1/24, C09C3/06, C01B13/36, C09C1/04
[2019/49]
Former International [2019/15]C01G9/02, C01B13/14, C01G49/06, C09C1/24, C09C3/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OXIDPARTIKELN MIT GESTEUERTEN FARBEIGENSCHAFTEN[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING OXIDE PARTICLES WITH CONTROLLED COLOR CHARACTERISTICS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES D'OXYDE À CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE COULEUR CONTRÔLÉES.[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018Translation filed 
07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Search fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0988853  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * claims 15-21 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0082] *;
 [X]DE102004004147  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-10 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] - [0038] - [0042] *;
 [X]  - Yang-Su Han ET AL, "Synthesis of Monodispersed and Spherical $SiO_2-coated Fe_2O_3$ Nanoparticle ArticleinBulletin-Korean Chemical Society . December 2000 CITATIONS 8 READS 88 3 authors, including", (20001001), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Yang_Su_Han/publication/264032925_Synthesis_of_Monodispersed_and_Spherical_SiO_2-coated_Fe_2O_3_Nanoparticle/links/54bd283e0cf218da93919334.pdf, (20190307), XP055566082 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[XA]WO0042112  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-7, 9, 12, 13 * , claims; pages 15, 25 to 27, 32 to 33, 35, 42 to 43; examples; table 3 & US 6534044 B1 claims; columns 9, 14 to 15, 18 to 20, 24 to 25; examples; table 3 & EP 1167462 A1 & CN 1340086 A & JP 4740458 B2 * [A] 8, 10, 11, 14, 15;
 [XA]WO9847476  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-5, 12, 13 * , claims; pages 12, 15; examples; fig. 1 & US 6235270 B1 claims; columns 7, 9; examples; fig. 1 & EP 988853 A1 & JP 2004-115541 A * [A] 6-11, 14, 15;
 [A]WO2008129901  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , claims; examples & US 2010/0021712 A1 claims; examples & JP 5158078 B2 & EP 2141205 A1 & CN 101652434 A *;
 [A]JP2008260648  (SPROUT NET WORKING KK) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2016060223  (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * , claims; examples & TW 201619259 A *