Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466298

EP3466298 - HYBRID TYPE FOAM AND COSMETIC KIT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cosmax, Inc.
46 Jeyakgongdan 2-gil
Hyangnam-eup
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18622 / KR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Sung Yong
(Anyang-dong), 403-ho
145-1, Naengcheon-ro
Manan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14000 / KR
02 / HWANG, Chul Hyun
(Jeonmin-dong, Expo Apt.)
206-408, 448 Expo-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34049 / KR
03 / YOO, Kweon Jong
(Jeongja-dong
Baekseol maeul Samhwan nowvill Apt.)
511-405
34, Cheoncheon-ro 22beon-gil, Jangan-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16332 / KR
04 / PARK, Myeong Sam
(Neung-dong
Neung-dong village)
302-ho, 93, Neungdong-ro 34-gil
Gwangjin-gu
Seoul 04987 / KR
05 / PARK, Chun Ho
(Bora-dong
Hanbora maeul humansia 5 danji Apt.)
507-1205
22, Hanbora1-ro 43beon-gil, Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17081 / KR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Lavoix
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17806977.930.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017KR05631
Priority number, dateKR2016006665030.05.2016         Original published format: KR 20160066650
[2019/15]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209484
Date:07.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466298
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A45D34/00, A45D40/00, C08L75/04, C08G18/08, C08G18/42, A61Q1/00, A61Q19/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:HYBRIDER SCHAUMSTOFF UND KOSMETISCHES KIT DAMIT[2019/15]
English:HYBRID TYPE FOAM AND COSMETIC KIT USING SAME[2019/15]
French:MOUSSE DE TYPE HYBRIDE ET KIT COSMÉTIQUE L'UTILISANT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2018Translation filed 
30.07.2018National basic fee paid 
30.07.2018Search fee paid 
30.07.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]KR200476594Y  (AMOREPACIFIC CORPORATION et al.) [Y] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0039]; claim 1. *;
 [Y]JP2002275304  (NICHIEI RUBBER KK) [Y] 1-21 * See paragraph [0012]; claim 4. *;
 [Y]KR20120108509  (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]) [Y] 6-8, 12, 17-20 * See paragraph [0017]; claims 1, 6; figures 3-4. *;
 [A]US2014213677  (JIMENEZ JORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See the entire document. *