Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466534

EP3466534 - SOLID CATALYST FOR PREPARING FATTY ACID METHYL OR ETHYL ESTER AND METHOD FOR PREPARING FATTY ACID METHYL OR ETHYL ESTER USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yoo, Seong Min
Jugong Apt. Burim-dong
806-1108
180 Byeoryang-ro
Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 13831 / KR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Yoo, Seong Min
Jugong Apt. Burim-dong
806-1108
180 Byeoryang-ro
Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 13831 / KR
02 / Yoo, Jeong Woo
7-1304, 333 Kwanpeong-ro
Dongan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 13932 / KR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Frischknecht, Harry Ralph
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807028.001.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017KR05734
Priority number, dateKR2016006882602.06.2016         Original published format: KR 20160068826
[2019/15]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209535
Date:07.12.2017
Language:KO
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466534
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/34, B01J37/00, B01J37/02, B01J35/08, B01J35/02, B01J32/00, C07C69/003, C07C67/62
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FESTER KATALYSATOR ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FETTSÄUREMETHYL- ODER ETHYLESTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FETTSÄUREMETHYL- ODER ETHYLESTERS DAMIT[2019/15]
English:SOLID CATALYST FOR PREPARING FATTY ACID METHYL OR ETHYL ESTER AND METHOD FOR PREPARING FATTY ACID METHYL OR ETHYL ESTER USING SAME[2019/15]
French:CATALYSEUR SOLIDE POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'ESTER MÉTHYLIQUE OU ÉTHYLIQUE D'ACIDE GRAS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'ESTER MÉTHYLIQUE OU ÉTHYLIQUE D'ACIDE GRAS L'UTILISANT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2018Translation filed 
28.12.2018National basic fee paid 
28.12.2018Search fee paid 
28.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
28.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]KR20100056129  (S M POT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * See claims 1-22. *;
 [A]US2015018572  (OH SHOSEI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * See claims 1-10. *;
 [A]JP2013072071  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [A] 1-6 * See claims 1-4. *;
 [A]JP4997681B  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO., LTD.) [A] 1-6 * See claims 1-4. *
 [A]  - VERHELST, J. et al., "Catalytic Self-cleaning Coatings for Thermal Oxidation of Organic Deposits on Glass", Catalysis Science & Technology, (20130000), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 1579 - 1590, XP055446090 [A] 1-6 * Seepages 1579-1581. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3cy20874e