Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465543

EP3465543 - FINGERPRINT SENSOR WITH CONTROLLABLE RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fingerprint Cards AB
P.O. Box 2412
403 16 Göteborg / SE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / RIEDIJK, Frank
Hugo de Grootstraat 156
2613 TZ Delft / NL
02 / THÖRNBLOM, Hans
Lilla Bäcksgatan 19
434 36 Kungsbacka / SE
03 / ANDERSSON, Daniel
Klareborgsgatan 28D
414 61 Göteborg / SE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kransell & Wennborg KB
P.O. Box 2096
403 12 Göteborg / SE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807112.230.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017SE50572
Priority number, dateSE2016005074430.05.2016         Original published format: SE 1650744
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209680
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465543
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06F3/044
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:FINGERABDRUCKSENSOR MIT STEUERBARER AUFLÖSUNG[2019/15]
English:FINGERPRINT SENSOR WITH CONTROLLABLE RESOLUTION[2019/15]
French:CAPTEUR D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES À RÉSOLUTION CONTRÔLABLE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2018National basic fee paid 
28.11.2018Search fee paid 
28.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
28.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2005124659  (FINGERPRINT CARDS AB ET AL) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; page 7, line 18 - page 7, line 21; page 8, line 7 - page 8, line 9; page 8, line 25 - page 8, line 27; page 12, line 14 - page 12, line 17; page 15, line 10 - page 15, line 12; page 19, line 20 - page 19, line 29; page 19, line 31 - page 20, line 3; figures 1,2a,8 *;
 [A]US2009067684  (MAINGUET JEAN-FRANCOIS) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0039]-[0041]; figure 10 *;
 [A]US2014359756  (ALAMEH RACHID M ETAL) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2014241595  (BERNSTEIN RALPH W ET AL) [A] 1-15 * ; whole document *;
 [A]US2004251917  (BLANCHARD RICHARD A) [A] 1-15 * ; whole document *;
 [A]US2010156805  (BRAND ZACHARY L ET AL) [A] 1-15 * ; whole document *;
 [A]US2003099380  (GOZZINI GIOVANNI) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; figure 11 *;
 [A]US2016034740  (WICKBOLDT PAUL ET AL) [A] 1-15 * ; abstract; paragraph [0067] *