Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466188

EP3466188 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING ACROSS MULTIPLE NETWORK TYPES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voyager Innovations Holdings Pte. Ltd.
100 Beach Road
No.25-06 Shaw Towers
Singapore 189702 / SG
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / VILLARICA, Rodolfo Alberto Asuncion
c/o 12th Floor Anson's Building
ADB Avenue
Ortigas Center
Pasig City 1605 / PH
02 / IBASCO, Alex Dy
c/o 12th Floor Anson's Building
ADB Avenue
Ortigas Center
Pasig City 1605 / PH
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807122.130.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017SG50276
Priority number, dateSG20161004398W31.05.2016         Original published format: SG10201604398W
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209693
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466188
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SG07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/10, H04W48/18, H04W8/26, H04W88/06
[2019/49]
Former International [2019/15]H04W76/02, H04W48/18, H04W8/26, H04W88/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION ÜBER MEHRERE NETZWERKTYPEN[2019/15]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING ACROSS MULTIPLE NETWORK TYPES[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ENTRE DE MULTIPLES TYPES DE RÉSEAU[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Search fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
29.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SG
21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US2014335854  (LABAUVE LANCE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0017] * * paragraphs [0032] , [0035] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraphs [0101] - [0105]; figure 11 *;
 [IA]US2006229078  (ITZKOVITZ AYAL [IL], et al) [I] 1,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0083] - [0096]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0102] - [0107] * * paragraphs [0108] - [0112]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0119] , [ 129] * * paragraphs [0146] - [0155]; figure 7 * [A] 2-13;
 [IA]WO2007047580  (PAGE2CELL INC [US], et al) [I] 1,15 * abstract * * page 4, lines 13-27 * * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 1 * [A] 2-14
International search[X]US2014335854  (LABAUVE LANCE [US], et al) [X] 1-60 * Figs. 11, 12; paras. [0013] [0017] [0079] [0084] [0103]-[0109] [0112] [0125] [0126] *;
 [X]WO2007047580  (PAGE2CELL INC [US], et al) [X] 1, 21, 41, 60 * Fig. 1; page 10, lines 25-28 *;
 [X]CN102413453  (ZTE CORP) [X] 1, 21, 41, 60 * Fig. 12; paras. [0178] [0194]-[0202] of the original non-English language document (a machine translation is enclosed only for your reference) *;
 [A]WO2008109995  (BLUESLICE NETWORKS INC [CA], et al) [A] 0 * Para. [0004] *;
 [A]US2007064607  (MOON JANG W [KR], et al) [A] 0 * Paras. [0006]-[0008] *;
 [A]US2014201293  (TURAKHIA BHAVIN [IN]) [A] 0 * Para. [0015] *;
 [A]WO2009124938  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 0 * The whole document. *