Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465016

EP3465016 - STRATIFIER FOR TANK-TYPE WATER HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A.O. Smith Corporation
11270 West Park Place Milwaukee
Wisconsin 53224 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TENG, Yingwu
5707 Cactus Valley Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28277 / US
02 / SCHULTZ, Michael, W.
325 Woodlands Ridge Rd.
Columbia, SC 29229 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dauncey, Mark Peter
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807153.621.03.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US23448
Priority number, dateUS201662345548P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345548 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209832
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465016
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F24D11/00, F28D20/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:STRATIFIZIERER FÜR TANKWASSERERHITZER[2019/15]
English:STRATIFIER FOR TANK-TYPE WATER HEATER[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF DE STRATIFICATION DESTINÉ À UN CHAUFFE-EAU DE TYPE RÉSERVOIR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2018National basic fee paid 
13.12.2018Search fee paid 
13.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4510922  (ROUSSOS et al.) [X] 1, 4-5, 7-13, 16, 18 * , entire document, especially Fig 1-2; col 2, In 15-22; col 3, In 15-35, 42-46, 57-59; col 4, In 29-44 * [Y] 2-3, 6, 14-15, 17, 19;
 [Y]US2011094706  (RAMANI) [Y] 2-3, 6, 14-15, 17, 19 * , entire document, especially Fig 1; para [0048], [0059]-[0060] *;
 [A]US2012125320  (ENGELHART) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2010326428  (ENGELHART) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *;
 [A]US7634976  (GORDON et al.) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *;
 [A]US4248294  (BUDZYNSKI et al.) [A] 1-19 * , entire document *