Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464737

EP3464737 - MULTIPIECE WEAR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H&L Tooth Company
10055 East 56th St. North
Tulsa OK 74117-4016 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / CLENDENNING, Charles
7514 Bushnell Blvd.
Broken Arrow, OK 74014 / US
02 / DRAKE, Russell, N.
1820 S. Haven Road
Claremore, OK 74019 / US
03 / LAUNDER, Brian, L.
10055 East 56th St. North
Tulsa, OK 74117-4016 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hartig, Michael
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807183.308.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US31538
Priority number, dateUS20161517241603.06.2016         Original published format: US201615172416
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017209898
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464737
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:E02F9/28
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MEHRTEILIGE BEKLEIDUNGSANORDNUNG[2019/15]
English:MULTIPIECE WEAR ASSEMBLY[2019/15]
French:ENSEMBLE D'USURE À PIÈCES MULTIPLES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Search fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
29.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US4965945  (EMRICH ROBERT K [US]) [A] 1-22 * , see entire document. *;
 [A]US6865828  (MOLINO JAVIER PUEVO [ES], et al) [A] 1-22 * , see entire document. *;
 [A]US7788830  (WOERMAN GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * , see entire document. *;
 [A]US2011030248  (CLENDENNING CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * , see entire document. *