Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465522

EP3465522 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING FILE ACCESS BY NODES OF A PROTECTED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 29.01.2020 [2020/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
P.O.Box 377
115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KNAPP, Eric D.
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road
M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
02 / BOICE, Eric T.
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property-Patent Services
115 Tabor Road
M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377
Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Houghton, Mark Phillip
Patent Outsourcing Limited
Corner House
1 King Street
Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807222.918.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US33251
Priority number, dateUS201662345735P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345735 P
US20171546971427.03.2017         Original published format: US201715469714
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017209967
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3465522
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.07.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/56, G06F21/62, H04L9/32
[2020/05]
Former International [2019/15]G06F21/60
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON DATEIZUGRIFF DURCH KNOTEN EINES GESCHÜTZTEN SYSTEMS[2019/15]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING FILE ACCESS BY NODES OF A PROTECTED SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR EMPÊCHER L'ACCÈS À DES FICHIERS PAR DES N UDS D'UN SYSTÈME PROTÉGÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Search fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2013291112  (SHUE CRAIG A [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0017], [0022], [0034]-[0037]; claim 1; and figures 2-4. *;
 [Y]WO2011148224  (PRIVYLINK PRIVATE LTD [SG], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See page 15 lines 26-28; page 22 lines 8-16; and figures 1-3. *;
 [A]US2009319782  (LEE RICHARD M [US]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0060], [0247]; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2013179940  (KRUMMEL VOLKER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0042]. *;
 [A]KR20120060396  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0046]; and figure 2. *