Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465355

EP3465355 - METHOD OF MUSIC INSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 15.01.2020  [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Downey, Patrick M.
412 French Street
Bangor, Maine 04401 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)MacLachlan & Donaldson
Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road
Citywest Business Campus
Dublin D24 C56E / IE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807253.424.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US34148
Priority number, dateUS20161516980301.06.2016         Original published format: US201615169803
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210049
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465355
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2019
ClassificationInternational:G04F5/02, G09B15/00, G09B5/04
[2020/03]
Former International [2019/15]G04F5/02, G09B15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR MUSIKUNTERRICHT[2019/15]
English:METHOD OF MUSIC INSTRUCTION[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'INSTRUCTION MUSICALE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Search fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
29.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2015032009  (RECABAL GUIRALDES PABLO [CL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] *;
 [I]US2004234076  (AGOSTINI LUIGI [IT]) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0024] *
International search[A]US9116509  (TAKAHASHI SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *;
 [A]US2011083544  (ROGITZ LEO C [US]) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *;
 [A]US2006070511  (PARSONS CHRISTOPHER V [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *;
 [A]US2004234076  (AGOSTINI LUIGI [IT]) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *;
 [A]WO03015471  (A & G SOLUZIONI DIGITALI S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-30 * , entire document. *