Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465371

EP3465371 - PLATOON CONTROLLER STATE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Peloton Technology Inc.
1060 La Avenida
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LAUBINGER, Lorenz
330 W. Portal Avenue, Apt. 203
San Francisco, CA 94127 / US
02 / ERLIEN, Stephen M.
829 Montgomery Street
Mountain View, CA 94041 / US
03 / SWITKES, Joshua P.
803 Emily Drive
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807337.530.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35019
Priority number, dateUS201662343819P31.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662343819 P
US201662363192P15.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662363192 P
US201662377970P22.08.2016         Original published format: US 201662377970 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210200
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465371
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G05D1/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ZUSTANDSMASCHINE EINES KOLONNENSTEUERGERÄTS[2019/15]
English:PLATOON CONTROLLER STATE MACHINE[2019/15]
French:MACHINE À ÉTATS POUR RÉGULATEUR DE PELOTON[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2018National basic fee paid 
21.12.2018Search fee paid 
21.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
01.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2013080040  (KUMABE SEIGOU [JP]) [X] 1, 2, 24 * ; paragraphs [0007], [0012], [0038]-[0040], [0042]-[0044], [0047], [0055], [0066], [0069], [0071], [0075], [0090], [0095], [0097] * [Y] 3/1, 3/2, 4;
 [Y]US2010256852  (MUDALIGE UPALI PRIYANTHA [US]) [Y] 3/1, 3/2, 4 * ; paragraphs [0114], [0129], [0152] *;
 [Y]US2015061492  (BRAUNBERGER FRITZ [US]) [Y] 4 * ; paragraphs [0094] [0119], [0157] *