Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463462

EP3463462 - METHODS OF DRUG THERAPY SELECTION FOR BREAST CANCER PATIENTS BASED ON HER2 AND HER3 PATHWAY SUBTYPING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / MICHEL, Joseph
c/o Pierian Holdings Inc.
405 Duke Drive
Suite 240
Franklin, Tennessee 37067 / US
02 / LANGLEY, Emma
c/o Pierian Holdings Inc.
405 Duke Drive
Suite 240
Franklin, Tennessee 37067 / US
03 / KIM, Phillip
c/o Pierian Holdings Inc.
405 Duke Drive
Suite 240
Franklin, Tennessee 37067 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807345.830.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35045
Priority number, dateUS201662343555P31.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662343555 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210214
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463462
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C40B30/04, G01N33/567, G01N33/574
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ARZNEIMITTELTHERAPIEAUSWAHL FÜR BRUSTKREBSPATIENTEN AUF DER BASIS VON HER2- UND HER3-WEG-SUBTYPISIERUNG[2019/15]
English:METHODS OF DRUG THERAPY SELECTION FOR BREAST CANCER PATIENTS BASED ON HER2 AND HER3 PATHWAY SUBTYPING[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE SÉLECTION DE PHARMACOTHÉRAPIE POUR DES PATIENTS ATTEINTS DE CANCER DU SEIN SUR LA BASE DU SOUS-TYPAGE DES VOIES HER2 ET HER3[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Search fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
12.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2012270745  (SINGH SHARAT [US], et al) [X] 1-62 * entire document *;
 [A]WO2014165855  (LAB CORP AMERICA HOLDINGS [US]) [A] 1-62 * entire document *;
 [A]WO2013033623  (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-62 * entire document *;
 [A]WO2010132723  (PROMETHEUS LAB INC [US], et al) [A] 1-62 * entire document *;
 [A]WO2005037071  (ACLARA BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-62 * entire document *
 [A]  - LIPTON et al., "HER3, p95HER2, and HER2 protein expression levels define multiple subtypes of HER2-positive metastatic breast cancer", Breast Cancer Res Treat, (20130820), vol. 141, no. 1, pages 43 - 53, XP055446258 [A] 1-62 * . entire document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10549-013-2665-0