Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465665

EP3465665 - MULTI-FUNCTION LIGHT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 15.01.2020 [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohinni, LLC
2139 N. Main Street
Coeur d'Alene, Idaho 83814 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PETERSON, Cody
c/o Rohinni LLC
2139 N. Main Street
Coeur D' Alene, ID 83814 / US
02 / HUSKA, Andy
c/o Rohinni LLC
2139 N. Main Street
Coeur D' Alene, ID 83814 / US
03 / WENDT, Justin
c/o Rohinni LLC
2139 N. Main Street
Coeur D' Alene, ID 83814 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17807350.830.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35062
Priority number, dateUS201662343756P31.05.2016         Original published format: US 201662343756 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210221
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465665
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G09F9/33
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:MULTIFUNKTIONSLICHTVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:MULTI-FUNCTION LIGHT APPARATUS[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE MULTIFONCTION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2018National basic fee paid 
30.11.2018Search fee paid 
30.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
05.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2015179141  (DABHI NAVIN T [US]) [X] 1, 8 * , claims 1, 11, paragraph 15 * [Y] 2-7, 9-20;
 [Y]US7646029  (MUELLER GEORGE G [US], et al) [Y] 2-7, 9-20 * , abstract, claims *;
 [Y]US6577080  (LYS IHOR [US], et al) [Y] 11-14 * , paragraph [0367] *