Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464088

EP3464088 - PACKAGE INCLUDING CARTON WITH INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Graphic Packaging International, LLC.
Law Department-9th Floor
1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100
Atlanta, GA 30328 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ACKROYD, Robert
19 The Crescent
Monk Fryston, Leeds LS25 5EF / GB
02 / BOERSMA, Harmen
Scholeksterstraat 24
8446 JB Heerenveen / NL
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b
82319 Starnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b
82319 Starnberg / DE
Application number, filing date17807371.431.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35120
Priority number, dateUS201662345355P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345355 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210249
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464088
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:B65D5/50, B65D5/44, B65D5/355
[2019/52]
Former International [2019/15]B65D5/50, B65D5/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNG MIT KARTON MIT EINSATZ[2019/15]
English:PACKAGE INCLUDING CARTON WITH INSERT[2019/15]
French:EMBALLAGE COMPRENANT UN CARTON AVEC UN ÉLÉMENT RAPPORTÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
29.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US1821692  (COPELAND GEORGE A) [X] 1-11,13-30 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 1 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 12,31,32;
 [XA]US698106  (DALSHEIMER SIMON [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,13-28,30 * page 1, line 48 - page 2, line 91 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 4,10,12,29,31,32;
 [XA]US3126144  (MC CULLOCH) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-28,30 * column 2, line 43 - column 8, line 11 * * figures 1-13 * [A] 4,12,29,31,32;
 [Y]US2013153449  (AGIRBAS ERDINC [DE]) [Y] 12,31,32 * paragraphs [0011] , [0027] - [0034] * * figures 1-5 *
International search[Y]US2005189251  (BRINGARD TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [Y] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0050], [0059]-[0061] and figures 4, 30-31, 35. *;
 [Y]JP2012131521  (YOU PACK KK) [Y] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0039], [0043], [0048] and figure 6. *;
 [A]JP2013023235  (NIPPON TOKAN PACKAGE KK) [A] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0031] and figure 4. *;
 [A]JP2013252895  (ECOLOGY KAIHATSU KK) [A] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0004]-[0013] and figure 1. *;
 [A]JP2015016889  (OJI HOLDINGS CORP) [A] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0039] and figure 2. *