EP3464088 - PACKAGE INCLUDING CARTON WITH INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, LLC. Law Department-9th Floor 1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100 Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKROYD, Robert 19 The Crescent Monk Fryston, Leeds LS25 5EF / GB | 02 /
BOERSMA, Harmen Scholeksterstraat 24 8446 JB Heerenveen / NL | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17807371.4 | 31.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US35120 | Priority number, date | US201662345355P | 03.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662345355 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017210249 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464088 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50, B65D5/44, B65D5/355 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
B65D5/445 (EP,US);
B65D5/0005 (EP);
B65D5/0227 (EP,US);
B65D5/10 (US);
B65D5/103 (EP,US);
B65D5/4266 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | B65D5/50, B65D5/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG MIT KARTON MIT EINSATZ | [2019/15] | English: | PACKAGE INCLUDING CARTON WITH INSERT | [2019/15] | French: | EMBALLAGE COMPRENANT UN CARTON AVEC UN ÉLÉMENT RAPPORTÉ | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 29.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US698106 (DALSHEIMER SIMON [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,13-28,30 * page 1, line 48 - page 2, line 91 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 4,10,12,29,31,32; | [XY]US1821692 (COPELAND GEORGE A) [X] 1-11,13-30 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 1 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 12,31,32; | [XA]US3126144 (MC CULLOCH) [X] 1-3,5-11,13-28,30 * column 2, line 43 - column 8, line 11 * * figures 1-13 * [A] 4,12,29,31,32; | [Y]US2013153449 (AGIRBAS ERDINC [DE]) [Y] 12,31,32 * paragraphs [0011] , [0027] - [0034] ** figures 1-5 * | International search | [Y]US2005189251 (BRINGARD TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [Y] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0050], [0059]-[0061] and figures 4, 30-31, 35. *; | [Y]JP2012131521 (YOU PACK KK) [Y] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0039], [0043], [0048] and figure 6. *; | [A]JP2013023235 (NIPPON TOKAN PACKAGE KK) [A] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0031] and figure 4. *; | [A]JP2013252895 (ECOLOGY KAIHATSU KK) [A] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0004]-[0013] and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2015016889 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP) [A] 1-51 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0039] and figure 2. * |