Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464187

EP3464187 - COALESCING FILTER MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hollingsworth & Vose Company
112 Washington Street
East Walpole, MA 02032 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BOESNER, Jens-peter
Schillerstrabe 10
35116 Hatzfeld (eder) / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807399.531.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35226
Priority number, dateUS20161516870931.05.2016         Original published format: US201615168709
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210301
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464187
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/00, B01D46/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:KOALESZIERENDE FILTERMEDIEN[2019/15]
English:COALESCING FILTER MEDIA[2019/15]
French:MILIEUX FILTRANTS COALESCENTS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Search fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]GB1434598  (CARBORUNDUM CO) [Y] 2, 3/2, 5-7 and 19 * . Entire document, especially Fig 2, it 14; pg 2, In 46-59; 77-80; 102-104; 114-120. * [A] 1 and 3/1;
 [YA]US6284843  (JARIWALA CHETAN P [US], et al) [Y] 2, 3/2, 5-7 and 19 * . Entire document, especially col 3, In 36-40; col 13, In 18-19; col 14, In 40-47 and col 20, In 38-48. * [A] 1 and 3/1;
 [YA]US8556089  (KALAYCI VELI E [US], et al) [Y] 3/2 * Entire document, especially col 41, In 46. * [A] 1, 3/1;
 [YA]US2015182878  (BULTINCK EVI [BE], et al) [Y] 5, 6 and 19 * Entire document, especially para [0075] and [0085]. * [A] 1, 3/1