Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471539

EP3471539 - KLRG1 SIGNALING THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Brigham and Women's Hospital
75 Francis Street
Boston, MA 02115 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / GREENBERG, Steven
270 Pleasant Street 406
Watertown MA 02472 / US
02 / GULLA, Stefano, Vincenzo
12 Bradbury Ave
Medford, MA 02155 / US
03 / THOMPSON, Kenneth, Evan
34 Cypress Rd.
Arlington, MA 02458 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hansen, Norbert
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17807546.102.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US35621
Priority number, dateUS201662345496P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345496 P
US201662401557P29.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662401557 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210523
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471539
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/00, A61K35/14, A61K35/28, A61K39/395
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KLRG1-SIGNALISIERUNGSTHERAPIE[2019/17]
English:KLRG1 SIGNALING THERAPY[2019/17]
French:TRAITEMENT DE SIGNALISATION PAR KLRG1[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Search fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
13.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2002155110  (TAKAHASHI NOBUAKI [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 7, 33-35 * abstract; para [0011]-[0021]; [0033]; [0040]-[0044]; [0054]. * [Y] 6, 26-31, 51, 56-58;
 [Y]WO2016070136  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 6 * p. 15, para 2; p. 19, para 3.. *;
 [Y]US2014050660  (CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US], et al) [Y] 26-31, 51 * abstract; claim 24. *;
 [Y]US2011091471  (YASUTAKE MIKITOMO [JP], et al) [Y] 56-58 * para [0050]; [0053]. *;
 [Y]  - LI et al., "Structure of natural killer cell receptor KLRG1 bound to E-cadherin reveals basis for MHC-independent missing self recognition", Immunity, (20090000), vol. 31.1, pages 35 - 46, XP055446198 [Y] 57, 58 * . entire document, especially p. 44, col 1, para 3. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.immuni.2009.04.019