Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463180

EP3463180 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR RECEIVING DISCHARGED URINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Purewick Corporation
2030 Gillespie Way Suite 109
El Cajon, California 92020 / US
For all designated states
Sanchez, Robert A.
5042 Greenstreak Drive
Riverton, Utah 84096 / US
For all designated states
Newton, Camille R.
31854 Wrightwood Road
Bonsall, California 92003 / US
For all designated states
Forehand, Joseph M.
4940 Resmar Road
La Mesa, California 91941 / US
For all designated states
Newton, Raymond J.
31854 Wrightwood Road
Bonsall, California 92003 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SANCHEZ, Robert A.
31854 Wrightwood Road
Bonsall California 92003 / US
02 / NEWTON, Camille R.
31854 Wrightwood Road
Bonsall California 92003 / US
03 / FOREHAND, Joseph M.
31854 Wrightwood Road
Bonsall California 92003 / US
04 / NEWTON, Raymond J.
31854 Wrightwood Road
Bonsall California 92003 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807547.902.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35625
Priority number, dateUS20161517196802.06.2016         Original published format: US201615171968
WO2016US4927429.08.2016         Original published format: PCT/US2016/049274
US20161526010308.09.2016         Original published format: US201615260103
US201662414963P31.10.2016         Original published format: US 201662414963 P
US201762485578P14.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762485578 P
US20171561158701.06.2017         Original published format: US201715611587
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210524
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463180
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61D99/00, A61F5/44, A61F5/443, A61F5/453, A61F5/455, A61F5/56, A61F6/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME VON AUSGESCHIEDENEM URIN[2019/15]
English:APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR RECEIVING DISCHARGED URINE[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉCEPTION D'URINE ÉVACUÉE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Search fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US8287508  (SANCHEZ ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1-19, 50-58, 60, 62-66 * entire document *;
 [A]US2005070862  (TAZOE WATARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-19, 50-66 * entire document *;
 [A]US2004236292  (TAZOE WATARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-19, 50-66 * entire document *;
 [PA]US2016374848  (SANCHEZ ROBERT A [US], et al) [PA] 1-19, 50-66 * entire document *