Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463307

EP3463307 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING MODIFIED RELEASE SOLABEGRON FOR LOWER URINARY TRACT SYMPTOMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Velicept Therapeutics, Inc.
101 Lindenwood Drive Suite 40
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / OHLSTEIN, Eliot
15 Yeaton Lane
Glennmoore Pennsylvania 19343 / US
02 / STEVENS, Raymond E.
24 Cherry Farm Lane
West Chester Pennsylvania 19382 / US
03 / WILKINS, H. Jeffrey
106 Brinkley Drive
Sellersville Pennsylvania 18960 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Delta House
50 West Nile Street
Glasgow G1 2NP / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807677.405.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US36016
Priority number, dateUS201662345388P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345388 P
US201662345519P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345519 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210700
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463307
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/16, A61K31/196
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON SOLABEGRON MIT MODIFIZIERTER FREISETZUNG FÜR SYMPTOME DER UNTEREN HARNWEGE[2019/15]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING MODIFIED RELEASE SOLABEGRON FOR LOWER URINARY TRACT SYMPTOMS[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION DU SOLABÉGRON À LIBÉRATION MODIFIÉE POUR TRAITER DES SYMPTÔMES DU BAS APPAREIL URINAIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase24.12.2018National basic fee paid 
24.12.2018Search fee paid 
24.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
24.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2012035118  (CALTABIANO, S et al.) [Y] 1, 4, 9-23, 28, 33-37, 42-53, 60-74, 76 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0002], [0008]-[0009], [0039]-[0042], [0049], [0057], [0059]-[0061], [0064]-[0065], [0070], [0097]-[0098] *;
 [Y]US2003082230  (BAICHWAL, AR et al.) [Y] 1, 4, 9-23, 28, 33-37, 42-53, 60, 63-64, 67-74, 76 * ; paragraphs [0014], [0018], [0020], [0025]-[0026], [0030], [0035], [0037], [0045] *;
 [Y]WO2015120110  (AUSPEX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.) [Y] 47-52, 61-66 * ; paragraphs [0021], [00184] *;
 [Y]US2015306170  (FERRING B.V.) [Y] 65-66 * ; paragraphs [0081]-[0082] *;
 [A]US2012258963  (BERGER, R et al.) [A] 2-3, 5-8, 24-27, 29-32, 38-41, 54-59, 75 * ; abstract; paragraph [0120] *;
 [PX]WO2016090168  (VELICEPT THERAPEUTICS, INC.) [PX] 1-76 * ; entire document *