Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463544

EP3463544 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING INTRAVASCULAR IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change - prioritypublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spartan Micro, Inc.
208 E. Liberty Street
Round Rock, Texas 78664 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / STOPPENHAGEN, Eric P.
208 E. Liberty Street
Round Rock Texas 78664 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)CSY London
10 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BR / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17807681.630.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US40425
Priority number, dateUS20171541063919.01.2017         Original published format: US201715410639
[2019/34]
Former [2019/15]US201662343528P31.05.2016
US201662343542P31.05.2016
US20171541063919.01.2017
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210705
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463544
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61M29/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FREISETZUNG VON INTRAVASKULÄREN IMPLANTATEN[2019/15]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DELIVERING INTRAVASCULAR IMPLANTS[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ADMINISTRATION D'IMPLANTS INTRAVASCULAIRES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2018National basic fee paid 
29.10.2018Search fee paid 
29.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.06.2017Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority
29.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
08.02.2019Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001, 0002
10.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2008269675  (BALGOBIN KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 1, 4-6, 10, 13-15 * fig 1, para [0021], [0023], [0027], [0029] * [A] 2-3, 7-9, 11-12, 16-18;
 [YA]US2007239196  (POMERANZ MARK L [US]) [Y] 1, 4-6, 10, 13-15 * para [0014] * [A] 2-3, 7-9, 11-12, 16-18;
 [YA]US2008045997  (BALGOBIN KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 1, 4-6, 13-15 * fig 1, 4A-9 para [0041][0042], [0044], [0052], [0061] * [A] 2-3, 7-9, 11-12, 16-18;
 [A]US2009036768  (SEEHUSEN ASHLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document, especially fig 14, para [0080] *