Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3541412

EP3541412 - CYAA POLYPEPTIDES AS IMMUNE ENHANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cyanimal IP
27 Avenue de Lanta
31280 Dremil-Lafage / FR
[2019/39]
Inventor(s)01 / NALIN, Renaud
27 avenue de Lanta
31280 Dremil Lafage / FR
02 / BOULLIER, Séverine
3 rue Paul Farrando
31100 Toulouse / FR
 [2019/39]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[2019/39]
Application number, filing date17809185.616.11.2017
[2019/39]
WO2017EP01341
Priority number, dateWO2016EP0245117.11.2016         Original published format: PCT/EP2016/002451
[2019/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018091142
Date:24.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3541412
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00, A61K38/16, A61K39/008, A61K39/02, A61K39/39
[2019/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CYAA-POLYPEPTIDE ALS IMMUNOMODULATORENVERSTÄRKER[2019/39]
English:CYAA POLYPEPTIDES AS IMMUNE ENHANCER[2019/39]
French:POLYPEPTIDES CYAA EN TANT QU'ACTIVATEURS IMMUNITAIRES[2019/39]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2019National basic fee paid 
06.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/39]
06.06.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP2689786  (GENTICEL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0013] , [0019] , [0020] , [0064] , [0071] , [0082]; claim 2 * * SEQ ID No. 2 of document 100% identical to SEQ ID No. 1 of application, SEQ ID No. 6 99.3% identical to SEQ ID No. 2 and 100% identical to SEQ ID No. 3, SEQ ID No. 20 99.8% identical to SEQ ID No. 8 * [Y] 4,10 [I] 9;
 [XY]EP2690172  (GENTICEL [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0009] , [0018] , [0019] , [0055] - [0058] - [0082] , [0083]; figure 2 * [Y] 4,10;
 [Y]WO2005039633  (MOLOGEN AG [DE], et al) [Y] 4,10 * claims 1-3 *
 [XDA]  - J JELINEK ET AL, "In vitro activation of CMV-specific human CD8+ T cells by adenylate cyclase toxoids delivering pp65 epitopes", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, GB, (20120201), vol. 47, no. 2, doi:10.1038/bmt.2011.68, ISSN 0268-3369, pages 243 - 250, XP055347286 [XD] 1-3,5,11 * abstract * * page 244, column l, paragraph 4 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 245, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 245, column r, paragraph 6 - page 248, column r, paragraph 2 * [A] 4,6-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/bmt.2011.68
 [X]  - GMIRA S ET AL, "Characterization of recombinant Bordetella pertussis adenylate cyclase toxins carrying passenger proteins", RESEARCH IN MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011201), vol. 152, no. 10, doi:10.1016/S0923-2508(01)01272-4, ISSN 0923-2508, pages 889 - 900, XP002209815 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * page 890, column l, paragraphs 1-4; figure 1; table 1 * * paragraphs [02.2] , [02.3] , [03.5] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-2508(01)01272-4
 [XAI]  - JANA HOLUBOVA ET AL, "Delivery of Large Heterologous Polypeptides across the Cytoplasmic Membrane of Antigen-Presenting Cells by the Bordetella RTX Hemolysin Moiety Lacking the Adenylyl Cyclase Domain", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 80, no. 3, doi:10.1128/IAI.05711-11, ISSN 0019-9567, (20120301), pages 1181 - 1192, (20120103), XP002685260 [X] 1,2,5-7 * abstract * * Introduction, MATERIALS AND METHODS: Deletion mutagenesis in the AC domain of CyaA, Presentation of the OVA257-264 epitope to the B3Z hybridoma in vitro, RESULTS: All information for translocation of the AC domain is contained within the Hly moiety of CyaA, DISCUSSION * [A] 3,4,8-10 [I] 11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/iai.05711-11
 [A]  - KARST J C ET AL, "Identification of a Region That Assists Membrane Insertion and Translocation of the Catalytic Domain of Bordetella pertussis CyaA Toxin", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, vol. 287, no. 12, doi:10.1074/JBC.M111.316166, ISSN 0021-9258, (20120316), pages 9200 - 9212, (20120112), XP002685261 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 9201, column r, paragraph 3 - page 9202, column l, paragraph 5 * * page 9204, column l, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 9209, column l, paragraph 3; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M111.316166
 [Y]  - YUK M H ET AL, "Modulation of host immune responses, induction of apoptosis and inhibition of NF-kappaB activation by the Bordetella type III secretion system", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20000301), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 991 - 1004, XP002580283 [Y] 4,10 * abstract * * page 992, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 1001, column r, paragraph 3 - page 1002, column l, paragraph 1 *
by applicantEP0149581
 GB2053231
 US4496538
 US4619828
 WO2006034395
 US8193185
 WO2012129483
    - HEMMI H et al., "small antiviral compounds activate immune cells via TLR7 MyD88 dependent signaling pathway", Nature Immunol., (20020000), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/ni758, pages 196 - 200, XP002392364

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni758
    - GLASER P. et al., Molecular Microbiology, (19880000), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 19 - 30
    - HOLUBOVA J. et al., Infect. Immun., (20120000), vol. 80, pages 1181 - 92
    - JELINEK J. et al., Bone Marrow Transpl., (20120000), vol. 47, pages 243 - 50
    - BENZ R. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, pages 27231 - 27239
    - MASIN J. et al., Infect. Immun., (20130000), vol. 81, pages 4571 - 4582
    - GRAY M. C. et al., J. Bacteriol., (20010000), vol. 183, pages 5904 - 5910
    - KARST J. C. et al., J Biol Chem., (20120000), vol. 287, pages 9200 - 9212
    - SUBRINI, O. et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20130000), vol. 10, page 1074
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, Ad. App. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEDDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMOLAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444
    - EDGARC, Nucleic Acids Research, (20040000), vol. 32, page 1792
    - GONZALES-ASEGUINOLAZA et al., Eur. J. Biochem., vol. 259, pages 909 - 916
    - OSICKA R. et al., Infect. Immun., (20000000), vol. 68, pages 247 - 256