Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465777

EP3465777 - A METHOD FOR PROCESSING SILICON MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NewSouth Innovations Pty Limited
Rupert Myers Building
Gate 14 Barker Street
University of New South Wales
Sydney, New South Wales 2052 / AU
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / WENHAM, Stuart Ross
19 Sturt Road
Cronulla New South Wales 2230 / AU
02 / CIESLA, Alison
19 Sturt Road
Cronulla New South Wales 2230 / AU
03 / HALLAM, Brett Jason
36A Washington Street
Bexley New South Wales 2207 / AU
04 / CHAN, Catherine Emily
1 Darling Street
Kensington New South Wales 2033 / AU
05 / CHONG, Chee Mun
1/1-3 Cooper Park
Bellevue Hill New South Wales 2023 / AU
06 / CHEN, Ran
2214/43 Wilson Street
Botany New South Wales 2019 / AU
07 / ABBOTT, Malcolm David
36 Dalleys Road
Naremburn New South Wales 2065 / AU
08 / PAYNE, David Neil
1/81 Doncaster Avenue
Kensington New South Wales 2033 / AU
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17809450.406.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017AU50560
Priority number, dateAU2016090219806.06.2016         Original published format: AU 2016902198
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210731
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465777
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/18, H01L21/30, // H01L31/068
[2019/19]
Former International [2019/15]H01L31/18, H01L21/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINES SILICIUMMATERIALS[2019/15]
English:A METHOD FOR PROCESSING SILICON MATERIAL[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MATÉRIAU DE SILICIUM[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2018National basic fee paid 
28.11.2018Search fee paid 
28.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
28.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2016141445  (HERGUTH AXEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12-14 * paragraphs [0001], [0004], [0006], [0008], [0010] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraphs [0044], [0054], [0055]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraphs [0098], [0102], [0103], [0106], [0108], [0109] * * paragraphs [0111] - [0115], figure 2 * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0124]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0127], [0129] * * claims 1-8 * [I] 4,6,9-11,15;
 [XI]US2015357510  (LEE KYOUNGSOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,7,12-14 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0066]; figure 4A * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0077]; figures 4B-4E * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0094]; figure 4F * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0098]; figure 4G * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0104]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0163] - paragraph [0165]; figure 10 * * claims 1, 6-8, 11-17 * [I] 2,4-6,8-11,15;
 [XAI]WO2015010168  (NEWSOUTH INNOVATIONS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,7,8,12-14 * page 1, line 7 - line 15 * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 4 * * page 6, line 15 - line 28 * * page 9, line 5 - line 19 * * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 13 * * page 10, line 23 - line 38 * * page 12, line 6 - line 27 * * page 13, line 29 - page 15, line 11; figures 7-15 * * page 15, line 16 - page 16, line 25; figures 16-24 * * page 17, line 3 - line 38; figures 25, 26 * * claims 1-4,10-14, 17, 18, 21-24, 29 * [A] 2,4-6,11,15 [I] 3,9,10;
 [A]US8263176  (HERGUTH AXEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,13,14 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 15 - line 27 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 23 - line 34 * * column 5, line 29 - line 42 * * column 6, line 17 - line 66 * * column 8, line 10 - column 9, line 51; figure 1 * * column 10, line 9 - line 25 * * column 10, line 35 - line 43 * * column 11, line 11 - line 20 * * claims 5,6,8,11 *
 [XAI]  - D. N. R. PAYNE ET AL, "Acceleration and mitigation of carrier-induced degradation in p-type multi-crystalline silicon", PHYSICA STATUS SOLIDI. RAPID RESEARCH LETTERS, DE, (20160301), vol. 10, no. 3, doi:10.1002/pssr.201510437, ISSN 1862-6254, pages 237 - 241, XP055566251 [X] 1,13 * abstract * * page 238, paragraph 2 - page 240, column l; figures 1b, 2 * [A] 2,4-7,12 [I] 3,9,10,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pssr.201510437
International search[X]WO2013173867  (NEWSOUTH INNOVATIONS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-21 * Abstract; Lines 4-6, Page 1; Lines 8-10, Page 6; Lines 1-15, Page 7; Pages 10-15, 18-20; Lines 1-19, Page 22; Lines 5-15, 27-34, Page 33 *;
 [A]US2015357510  (LEE KYOUNGSOO [KR], et al) [A] 0 * Figure 5; [0084]-[0100] *;
 [A]US2009253225  (DUBOIS SEBASTIEN [FR], et al) [A] 0 * [0030]-[0036] *;
 [A]US2008075840  (ENJALBERT NICOLAS [FR], et al) [A] 0 * [0011 ]-[00 15] *;
 [A]  - YANG, L. et al., "Investigating the Effect of Thermal Annealing Process on the Photovoltaic Performance of the Graphene-Silicon Solar Cell", International Journal of Photoenergy, (20150000), pages 1 - 6, XP055396855 [A] 0 * . Page 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2015/893916