Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468354

EP3468354 - SYSTEM FOR MONITORING PASTURE INTAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Clunies Ross Street
Acton, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU
For all designated states
The Department of Primary Industries, an Office of The Department of Industry, Skills and Regional Developm. for and on behalf
Department of Primary Industries
161 Kite Street
Orange, New South Wales 2800 / AU
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / INGHAM, Aaron
c/- CSIRO Black Mountain Science and
Innovation Park
Clunies Ross Street
Acton Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU
02 / RAHMAN, Ashfaqur
c/- CSIRO Black Mountain Science and
Innovation Park
Clunies Ross Street
Acton Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU
03 / SMITH, Daniel
c/- CSIRO Black Mountain Science and
Innovation Park
Clunies Ross Street
Acton Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU
04 / BISHOP-HURLEY, Greg
c/- CSIRO Black Mountain Science and
Innovation Park
Clunies Ross Street
Acton Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU
05 / VALENCIA, Philip
CSIRO Black Mountain Science and
Innovation Park
Clunies Ross Street
Acton Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU
06 / GREENWOOD, Paul
c/- Department of Primary Industries
161 Kite Street
Orange New South Wales 2800 / AU
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date17809459.508.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017AU50569
Priority number, dateAU2016090223808.06.2016         Original published format: AU 2016902238
AU2017090030301.02.2017         Original published format: AU 2017900303
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210740
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468354
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A01K29/00, A01K11/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER FUTTERAUFNAHME[2019/16]
English:SYSTEM FOR MONITORING PASTURE INTAKE[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'INGESTION D'HERBE DE PÂTURE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2011069512  (UNIV SYDDANSK [DK], et al) [X] 1-7, 12-24 * Figures 1 - 7, page 15, lines 16 - 20 and page 16, lines 20 - 30. *;
 [X]WO2016059626  (HERD MOONITOR LTD [IL]) [X] 1-7, 12-24 * Figures 1 - 3, page 7 lines 11 - 22, page 10 lines 21 - 25 and table 1. *;
 [X]WO2013005038  (MOTTRAM TOBY [GB], et al) [X] 1-7, 12, 13, 16-24 * Figures 1 - 7, Abstract, page 2, lines 13 - 19 and page 7 line 27 - page 8 line 10. *;
 [X]US6115679  (RUTTER STEVEN MARK [GB], et al) [X] 1, 3-7, 16-24 * Figures 1 - 2 and column 2, lines 20 - 53. *;
 [X]US7705736  (KEDZIORA JOHN [US]) [X] 1-7, 16-24 * Figures 1 - 11, column 11, lines 50 - 61 and column 9, lines 33 - 36. *;
 [X]US2016066546  (BORCHERSEN SØREN [DK], et al) [X] 1, 3-7, 16-24 * Figures 1 - 2, paragraphs [0021] and [0016]. *;
 [A]US2012221250  (COTTLE DAVID JOHN [AU]) [A] 0;
 [A]US2011174229  (KERLEY MONTY S [US], et al) [A] 0
 [X]  - GODSK T. et al., "High Classification Rates for Continuous Cow Activity Recognition Using Low-Cost GPS Positioning Sensors and Standard Machine Learning Techniques", Advances in Data Mining. Applications and Theoretical Aspects. ICDM 2011. Lecture Notes in Computer Science, Berlin , Heidelberg, (20110000), vol. 6870, pages 174 - 188, XP047434509 [X] 1-13, 16-24 * Abstract, Figures 1b, 2, 4, page 4 lines 12 - 19, page 6, lines 16 - 21 and tables 1 and 4. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-23184-1_14
 [X]  - RITABAN DUTTA et al., IEEE SENSORS 2014 Proceedings,20141102IEEE, Valencia, Spain, (20141102), ISBN 978-1-4799-0162-3, pages 1272 - 1275, XP032702627 [X] 1-10, 12, 13, 16-24 * . Abstract, Figures 1,4 and page 1 - Motivation. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSENS.2014.6985242