Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469622

EP3469622 - IMPROVEMENTS IN ELECTRON MULTIPLIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETP Ion Detect Pty Ltd
2-8 Martha Street
Clyde, NSW 2142 / AU
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SHEILS, Wayne
2-8 Martha Street
Clyde, New South Wales 2142 / AU
02 / HUNTER, Kevin
2-8 Martha Street
Clyde, New South Wales 2142 / AU
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Walker, Ross Thomson
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17809460.308.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017AU50570
Priority number, dateUS201662347713P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347713 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210741
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469622
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01J43/18, H01J43/10, H01J43/04, H01J43/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN ELEKTRONENMULTIPLIKATOREN[2019/16]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN ELECTRON MULTIPLIERS[2019/16]
French:PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTÉS À DES MULTIPLICATEURS D'ÉLECTRONS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Search fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO02086944  (VARIAN AUSTRALIA [AU], et al) [X] 1-16 * Abstract, Page 1, Lines 5-12, 15-29, Page 4, Line 14 to Page 5, Line 2, Page 7, Line 6 to Page 10, Line 22, Figures 2-7 *;
 [X]US2015187550  (HIRANO KAZUSHI [JP]) [X] 1-16 * Abstract, Paragraphs [0016]-[0019], [0032]-[0035], Figure 1 *;
 [X]US3997779  (RABL CARL-ROLAND) [X] 1, 3-7, 11-13, 15-16 * Abstract, Column 2, Line 39 to Column 3, Line 17, Column 4, Line 13 to Column 5, Line 31, Figures *;
 [X]US2009057548  (HIDALGO AUGUST [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-7, 11-13, 15-16 * Abstract, Paragraphs [0014]-[0067], Figures *;
 [X]GB2190785  (BALL GEOFFREY WILLIAM) [X] 1, 3-7, 11-13, 15-16 * Abstract, Page 1, Line 5 to Page 3, Line 6, Figures *;
 [X]AU3623784  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG) [X] 1, 3-7, 11-13, 15-16 * Page 2, Line 1 to Page 12, Line 32, Figures *