Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3469622 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3469622



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 113
09.12.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
14.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
10.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.12.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.12.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
10.12.2018 Annex Search / examination 1
10.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.11.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
14.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 32