Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468728

EP3468728 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WASHING TRADES EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Geosentinel Pty Ltd
1 Shackel Avenue
Clovelly, New South Wales 2031 / AU
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CRIMSTON, Andrew
10 Perry Road
Arcadia, New South Wales 2159 / AU
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date17809463.708.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017AU50573
Priority number, dateAU2016090227610.06.2016         Original published format: AU 2016902276
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210744
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468728
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B08B3/02, B08B3/04, B08B7/04, B08B9/08, B08B9/34, C02F1/52, A46B17/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM WASCHEN VON HANDWERKSAUSRÜSTUNG[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WASHING TRADES EQUIPMENT[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE LAVAGE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT COMMERCIAL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.09.2019Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2012024729  (GEOSENTINEL PTY LTD) [X] 1-28 * Abstract, page 4, lines 7-20, page 5, lines 1-8, 28-30, page 10, lines 4-22, fig.4 *;
 [A]US5836321  (KANESKI et al) [A] 1-28 * Abstract *;
 [A]US2007006897  (SARRI et al) [A] 1-28 * Abstract *