Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468444

EP3468444 - AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR USING INFRARED THERMOGRAPHY FOR VIEWING A TEAR FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beyond 700 Pty Ltd
Unit 38/9 Hoyle Avenue
Caster Hill, NSW 2154 / AU
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLAR, Thomas
c/ Davies Collison Cave Pty Ltd
Level 14, 255 Elizabeth Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
02 / SCHUETT, Burkhardt Siegfried
c/- Davies Collison Cave Pty Ltd
Level 14, 255 Elizabeth Street
Sydney, New South Wales 2000 / AU
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17809465.208.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017AU50575
Priority number, dateAU2016020380508.06.2016         Original published format: AU 2016203805
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210746
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468444
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/10, A61B5/01, A61B3/14, G06T7/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER INFRAROT-THERMOGRAFIE ZUR ANSICHT EINES TRÄNENFILMS[2019/16]
English:AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR USING INFRARED THERMOGRAPHY FOR VIEWING A TEAR FILM[2019/16]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE THERMOGRAPHIE INFRAROUGE PERMETTANT DE VISUALISER UN FILM LACRYMAL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Search fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
23.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
10.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2013079660  (CHANG O [TW], et al) [X] 1-2, 4, 11-20 * See paragraphs [0023], [0031], [0032] ,claim 1 and figures 5A-5B See paragraphs [0023], [0031], [0032], claim 1 and figures 5A-5B * [Y] 3, 5-10;
 [XY]US2012057126  (CHANG O [TW], et al) [X] 1-2 , 4, 11-20 * See paragraphs [0032], [0036],[0038], [0054-0055] and figures 2D-2F See paragraphs [0032], [0036],[0038], [0054-0055] and figures 2D-2F * [Y] 3, 5-10;
 [A]US2008174733  (CHANG DAVID O [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * see whole document *
 [XY]  - MILLAR et al., "The real reason for having a meibomian lipid layer covering the outer surface of the tear film-A review", Experimental Eye Research, vol. 137, (20150514), pages 125 - 138, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/ science /article/pii/S001448351500144X, (20170606), XP029250271 [X] 1-2, 4, 11, 14-20 * See graphical abstract See graphical abstract * [Y] 3, 5-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2015.05.002
 [Y]  - ABREAU, K. et al., "Temperatures of the Ocular Surface, Lid, and Periorbital Regions of Sjogren's, Evaporative, and Aqueous-Deficient Dry Eyes Relative to Normals", The Ocular Surface, (20160100), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 64 - 73, XP055444112 [Y] 3, 5-6, 8-10 * . See page 66 under the heading "C. Thermal Imaging" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtos.2015.09.001
 [Y]  - WING, L. et al., "Ocular Surface Cooling Corresponds to Tear Film Thinning and Breakup", Optometry and Vision Science, (20150900), vol. 92, no. 9, doi:10.1097/OPX.0000000000000672, ISSN 1538-9235, pages e248 - e256, XP009513814 [Y] 3, 5-10 * . See page e249 under the heading "Instrumentation and Procedures" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/OPX.0000000000000672