EP3467149 - METHOD FOR THE NANOMETRIC DEPOSITION OF CALCIUM PHOSPHATE ON THE SURFACE OF AN ANODIZED TITANIUM IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brunella Sily De Assis, Bumachar Rua Mato Grosso no. 80 Praia da Costa Vila Velha, CEP 29102121 / BR | For all designated states Serafim, Alexandre José Alameda Helio C. Ferraz 145 Apt 1301 Praia de Santa Helena CEP.: 29055-090 Vitória ES / BR | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUÑIZ FERREIRA, José Ricardo Condominio Reserva Colonial Quadra 21 Lote 10 Valinhos CEP 13278-141 / BR | 02 /
NAVARRO DA ROCHA, Daniel Rua Martins Ribeiro 12/302 Flamengo Rio de Janeiro CEP 22231-150 / BR | 03 /
PRADO DA SILVA, Marcelo Henrique Rua Silveira Martins 140/101 Ipanema CEP 22420-041 / BR | 04 /
BLAZUTTI MARCAL, Rubens Lincoln Rua Silveira Martins 140/101 Ipanema CEP 22210-000 / BR | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Felber, Josef, et al Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17809474.4 | 02.03.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017BR00020 | Priority number, date | BR2010201612926 | 06.06.2016 Original published format: BR10201612926 | [2019/15] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017210757 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | PT | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3467149 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 14.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/07, B05D5/02, A61L27/32, C23C22/73, C23C22/83, C25D11/18, C25D11/24, C25D11/26, A61L27/06 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
A61L27/32 (EP,US);
A61L27/06 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP);
B05D5/02 (US);
C23C22/07 (US);
C25D11/26 (EP);
A61F2/30767 (US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00796 (EP,US);
A61L2400/12 (EP);
A61L2430/02 (EP);
A61L27/50 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | C23C22/07, B05D5/02, A61L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NANOMETRISCHEN ABSCHEIDUNG VON CALCIUMPHOSPHAT AUF DER OBERFLÄCHE EINES ANODISIERTEN TITANIMPLANTATS | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD FOR THE NANOMETRIC DEPOSITION OF CALCIUM PHOSPHATE ON THE SURFACE OF AN ANODIZED TITANIUM IMPLANT | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT NANOMÉTRIQUE DE PHOSPHATE DE CALCIUM SUR LA SURFACE D'IMPLANT DE TITANE ANODISÉ | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2019 | Translation filed | 12.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 22.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 19.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010126436 (BIOMATCELL AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]US2014377449 (BARBAS ALEXANDRE [FR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015028100 (STRYKER TRAUMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5141576 (SHIMAMUNE TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * (see claim 1) *; | [A]US6280789 (REY CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-18* (see exemple 1 and claims) *; | [A]US7785648 (ROHANIZADEH RAMIN [AU], et al) [A] 1-18 * (exemples and claims) *; | [A]US2012271431 (NIES BERTHOLD [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * (see exemples 1-2 and claims) * |