blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3469323
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10401241Global Dossier 03.09.2019B2
US2017356815 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662347601 08.06.2016
US201715618113 08.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3469323Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201662347601 08.06.2016
WO2017CA50704 08.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017210795Global Dossier 14.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662347601 08.06.2016