Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469323

EP3469323 - SURFACE SENSOR ARRAYS USING IONICALLY CONDUCTING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of British Columbia
University - Industry Liaison Office
103-6190 Agronomy Road
Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MADDEN, John
3958 West 17th Avenue
Vancouver, British Columbia V6S 1A5 / CA
02 / DOBASHI, Yuta
308 - 1165 West 13th Avenue
Vancouver, British Columbia V6H 1N4 / CA
03 / SARWAR, Mirza Saquib
1220-2205 Lower Mall
Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z4 / CA
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17809508.908.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CA50704
Priority number, dateUS201662347601P08.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347601 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210795
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469323
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01L1/16, A61B5/0205, A61G7/05, G01L1/14, G01L1/18, G01L5/22
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:OBERFLÄCHENSENSORARRAYS MIT IONISCH LEITFÄHIGEM MATERIAL[2019/16]
English:SURFACE SENSOR ARRAYS USING IONICALLY CONDUCTING MATERIAL[2019/16]
French:RÉSEAUX DE CAPTEURS DE SURFACE UTILISANT UN MATÉRIAU CONDUCTEUR D'IONS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
06.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AP]WO2016141468  (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]) [A] 1 to 32 * Entire document * [P] 0