Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470011

EP3470011 - DENTURE SYSTEM AND PROSTHESIS USED IN DENTURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sunrise Associates Corporation
1528 Higashisakabe-cho
Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 512-0904 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAO Yoshiharu
1287-1 Oaza Nishiakuragawa
Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0812 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel
Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17809887.728.02.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP07942
Priority number, dateWO2016JP6705808.06.2016         Original published format: PCT/JP2016/067058
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212703
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470011
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/01
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ZAHNPROTHESENSYSTEM UND PROTHESE FÜR DAS ZAHNPROTHESENSYSTEM[2019/16]
English:DENTURE SYSTEM AND PROSTHESIS USED IN DENTURE SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE PROTHÈSE DENTAIRE ET PROTHÈSE UTILISÉE DANS LE SYSTÈME DE PROTHÈSE DENTAIRE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]JP2013135863  (SHOFU INC) [X] 12-13 * , paragraphs [0005], [0008], [0031] to [0035]; fig. 22 to 25 (Family: none) * [A] 1-11;
 [A]JP2015165850  (TOKUYAMA DENTAL CORP) [A] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP4686541B  (Hideo NAKAGAWA) [A] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2009/0047627 A1 & WO 2006/131969 A1 *