Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470582

EP3470582 - WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
16-1, HigashiUeno 2-chome
Taito-ku
Tokyo 110-0015 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEUCHI Hiroki
c/o Tsuchiura Works
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
650 Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
02 / ISHIKAWA Kouji
c/o Tsuchiura Works
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
650 Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
03 / IZUMI Shiho
c/o Tsuchiura Works
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
650 Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
04 / MEGURIYA Shuuichi
c/o Tsuchiura Works
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
650 Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
05 / AKITA Tarou
c/o Tsuchiura Works
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
650 Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17809893.502.03.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP08369
Priority number, dateJP2016011512309.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016115123
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212709
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470582
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:E02F3/43, E02F9/20, F15B11/04, F15B11/08, F15B11/16
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ARBEITSMASCHINE[2019/16]
English:WORK MACHINE[2019/16]
French:ENGIN DE CHANTIER[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2018Translation filed 
09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JP3091667B  (Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-4 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 8-333768 A & US 5735065 A entire text; all drawings & EP 747541 A1 & DE 69618385 D & DE 69618385 T & KR 10-0174137 B & CN 1140782 A *;
 [A]JP2016003442  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1-4 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010190368  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1-4 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH0771051  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1-4 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH08500418  (Mannesmann Rexroth GmbH) [A] 1-4 * , entire text; all drawings & US 5640892 A entire text; all drawings & WO 1994/004829 A1 & EP 656100 A1 & DE 4231399 A1 *