Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470849

EP3470849 - AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi High-Technologies Corporation
24-14 Nishishimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8717 / JP
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacher Strasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ISHIDA Takeshi
c/o HITACHI, LTD.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
02 / ADACHI Sakuichiro
c/o HITACHI, LTD.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
03 / YAMASHITA Yoshihiro
c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8717 / JP
04 / NOBUKI Shunichirou
c/o HITACHI, LTD.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
05 / YABUTANI Hisashi
c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8717 / JP
06 / YAMAZAKI Isao
c/o HITACHI HIGH-TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
24-14 Nishi Shimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8717 / JP
07 / HAUPTMANN Bernhard
Waldstrasse 1a
82377 Penzberg / DE
08 / WINDFUHR Michaela
Erlenweg 14
82393 Iffeldorf / DE
09 / KUESTER Simon
Gautinger Strasse 23C
82152 Krailling / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17809990.924.04.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP16151
Priority number, dateJP2016011492409.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016114924
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212808
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470849
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/00, A61L2/10, C02F1/32
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE ANALYSEVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE AUTOMATIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018Translation filed 
09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]JPS63163168  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-12, 15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * [A] 13-14;
 [YA]JPH08117742  (IWASHITA TADAHIDE) [Y] 1-12, 15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * [A] 13-14;
 [YA]JP2011147362  (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD) [Y] 1-12, 15 * , paragraphs [0033] to [0076]; fig. 1 to 10 & US 2012/0295301 A1 paragraphs [0054] to [0101]; fig. 1 to 10 & WO 2011/089784 A1 & EP 2527422 A1 * [A] 13-14;
 [YA]JPH10216711  (KURIHARA KOGYO KK) [Y] 10-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * [A] 13-14;
 [YA]JPS527962U  (Sankyo Denki Kabushiki Kaisha) [Y] 12 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * [A] 13-14;
 [A]JP2007007083  (UNIV TOKUSHIMA, et al) [A] 13-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [YA]JPH03503730  (Iatros Ltd.) [Y] 15 * , page 4, upper right column, line 12 to lower left column, line 3; fig. 5 & US 5133932 A column 5, lines 31 to 47; fig. 5 & WO 1989/009067 A1 & EP 422007 A1 * [A] 13-14