Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470485

EP3470485 - TWO-COMPONENT CURABLE URETHANE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd.
36-11 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8685 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ABE Megumi
C/O The Yokohama Rubber Co. LTD.
Hiratsuka Factory
2-1 Oiwake
Hiratsuka City Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP
02 / MATSUKI Yuichi
C/O The Yokohama Rubber Co. LTD.
Hiratsuka Factory
2-1 Oiwake
Hiratsuka City Kanagawa 254-8601 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstrasse 58
80636 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810006.127.04.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP16722
Priority number, dateJP2016011550709.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016115507
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212824
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470485
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09J175/04
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:HÄRTBARE ZWEI-KOMPONENTEN-URETHANKLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2019/16]
English:TWO-COMPONENT CURABLE URETHANE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE D'URÉTHANE DURCISSABLE À DEUX COMPOSANTS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018Translation filed 
03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Search fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2014517089  (Henkel AG. & Co. KGaA) [Y] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0010], [0049] to [0050], [0059], [0062]; examples (V5, V14) & US 2013/0190447 A1 claims; paragraphs [0009], [0046], [0055], [0058]; examples (V5, V14) & WO 2012/139940 A1 & EP 2697277 A1 & CN 103476818 A *;
 [Y]JP2006111811  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0025], [0060], [0070], [0074]; examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015113411  (HENKEL JAPAN LTD) [A] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0039], [0041]; examples & WO 2015/088037 A1 *;
 [A]JP2006282959  (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , claims; paragraphs [0024] to [0025] (Family: none) *