Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470035

EP3470035 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
20.12.2019Change - classificationpublished on 22.01.2020  [2020/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daio Paper Corporation
2-60 Mishimakamiya-cho Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0492 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SENO, Shunji
c/o ELLEAIR PRODUCT CO. LTD.
4765-11 Sangawa-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0431 / JP
02 / MATSUOKA, Hiroki
c/o ELLEAIR PRODUCT CO. LTD.
4765-11 Sangawa-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0431 / JP
03 / MORITANI, Akie
c/o ELLEAIR PRODUCT CO. LTD.
4765-11 Sangawa-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0431 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Williams Powell
11 Staple Inn
London WC1V 7QH / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810040.011.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP17810
Priority number, dateJP2016011560009.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016115600
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212858
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470035
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/514
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL[2019/16]
English:ABSORBENT ARTICLE[2019/16]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2018Translation filed 
22.11.2018National basic fee paid 
22.11.2018Search fee paid 
22.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
22.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2005245789  (KAO CORP) [X] 1-3,5 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] - [0036] * [I] 4
International search[A]JP2011225000  (DAIO SEISHI KK, et al) [A] 1-5 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015192862  (KAO CORP) [A] 1-5 * , & WO 2015/146704 A1 *;
 [A]JP2008025083  (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1-5 * , & US 2008/0044622 A1 & WO 2007/148501 A1 & EP 2034070 A1 & CN 101443502 A *;
 [A]JPH03251245  (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1-5 * , (Family: none) *