Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470814

EP3470814 - TIRE DETERIORATION STATE PREDICTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / TAMURA Daisuke
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / SAKAI Keiichi
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
03 / YAMAZAKI Shinichiro
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
04 / KOMORI Seita
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17810096.223.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP19250
Priority number, dateJP2016011548009.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016115480
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212915
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470814
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01M17/02, B60C19/00, G06F17/50, B60C11/24
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:REIFENVERSCHLEISSZUSTANDVORHERSAGEVERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:TIRE DETERIORATION STATE PREDICTION METHOD[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION D'ÉTAT DE DÉTÉRIORATION DE PNEUMATIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
28.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2703194  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0017]; figure 2 *;
 [YD]JP2010167847  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [YD] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH05152234  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[Y]JP2010167847  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0027]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPH05152234  (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-5 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0018] to [0023] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2005306174  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0025]; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2005138621  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0032] to [0071]; fig. 1 to 16 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2007210528  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0002], [0009] to [0012]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2010167847
    - KEVIN R. J. ELLWOOD; JOHN BALDWIN; DAVID R. BAUER, "Numerical Simulation of Thermal Oxidation in Automotive Tires", Rubber Chemistry and Technology, (20060000), vol. 79, no. 2