Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470676

EP3470676 - PUMP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYB Corporation
World Trade Center Building
2-4-1, Hamamatsu-cho
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6111 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SAKAI, Yuki
c/o KYB Corporation
World Trade Center Bldg.
4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6111 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810100.223.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP19284
Priority number, dateJP2016011442708.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016114427
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212919
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470676
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F04B49/06, F15B11/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:PUMPVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:PUMP DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE POMPE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2014156532  (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0091]; fig. 1 to 3 & US 2016/0003237 A1 paragraphs [0001] to [0093]; fig. 1 to 3 *;
 [A]JP2010230133  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0057]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2000120604  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0045]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *