Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471055

EP3471055 - COMPARISON DEVICE AND COMPARISON METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NOZUE Yosuke
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-06207 / JP
02 / MAENO Kazuki
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-06207 / JP
03 / YOSHIO Hiroaki
c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management
Co., Ltd.
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-06207 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810146.529.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP19865
Priority number, dateJP2016011448008.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016114480
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212967
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471055
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00, G06K9/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERGLEICHSVORRICHTUNG UND VERGLEICHSVERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:COMPARISON DEVICE AND COMPARISON METHOD[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMPARAISON ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMPARAISON[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2018Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
06.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
06.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]  - Aisha Azeem ET AL, "A Survey: Face Recognition Techniques under Partial Occlusion", The International Arab Journal of Information Technology, (20140101), pages 1 - 10, URL: https://iajit.org/PDF/vol.11,no.1/4135.pdf, (20190226), XP055561904 [A] 3,9 * Section 2.1 *
International search[YA]JP2013097760  (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [Y] 1-2, 5, 7-8, 11 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0017], [0031] to [0042], [0049] to [0059]; fig. 1, 4, 7 to 8 (Family: none) * [A] 3-4, 6, 9-10, 12;
 [YA]JP2005071009  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, 5, 7-8, 11 * , paragraphs [0037] to [0058]; fig. 4 & US 2006/0165265 A1 paragraphs [0047] to [0068]; fig. 4 & WO 2005/020149 A1 & EP 1536375 A1 & CN 1739120 A * [A] 3-4, 6, 9-10, 12;
 [A]JP2016081212  (NEC CORP) [A] 3-4, 6, 9-10, 12 * , claims 1 to 10 & US 2016/0110586 A1 claims 1 to 18 *