Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471133

EP3471133 - MEMORY ARRAY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEMORY ARRAY, MEMORY ARRAY SHEET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEMORY ARRAY SHEET, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toray Industries, Inc.
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAI, Shota
c/o Shiga Plant
Toray Industries Inc.
1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP
02 / MURASE, Seiichiro
c/o Shiga Plant
Toray Industries Inc.
1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP
03 / SHIMIZU, Hiroji
c/o Shiga Plant
Toray Industries Inc.
1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810151.529.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP19953
Priority number, dateJP2016011241606.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016112416
JP2016014701327.07.2016         Original published format: JP 2016147013
JP2017003462027.02.2017         Original published format: JP 2017034620
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212972
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471133
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/8246, H01L27/10, H01L27/112, H01L29/786, H01L51/05, H01L51/30
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:SPEICHER-ARRAY, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SPEICHER-ARRAYS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SPEICHER-ARRAY-FOLIE UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:MEMORY ARRAY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEMORY ARRAY, MEMORY ARRAY SHEET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MEMORY ARRAY SHEET, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE[2019/16]
French:MATRICE MÉMOIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MATRICE MÉMOIRE, FEUILLE DE MATRICES MÉMOIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FEUILLE DE MATRICES MÉMOIRE, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2018Translation filed 
20.11.2018National basic fee paid 
20.11.2018Search fee paid 
20.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
26.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]JPH05211316  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [X] 1, 2 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0017]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) * [Y] 9, 10, 12, 13, 16, 17, 20, 21, 26, 27 [A] 3-8, 11, 14, 15, 18, 19, 22-25;
 [Y]JP2008034083  (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB) [Y] 9, 10 * , paragraph [0045]; fig. 1 to 21 & US 2008/0002454 A1 paragraph [0047]; fig. 1 to 21 *;
 [XYA]WO2006003844  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) [X] 18, 19, 24-27 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0027], [0038], [0048], [0049], [0060], [0061], [0108]; fig. 1 to 13 (Family: none) * [Y] 12, 13, 16, 17, 20, 21, 26, 27 [A] 1-11, 14, 15, 22, 23;
 [A]JP2008305964  (SPANSION LLC) [A] 1-27 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0028], [0031] to [0034]; fig. 1 to 14 & US 2008/0316790 A1 paragraphs [0031] to [0041], [0044] to [0047]; fig. 1 to 14 *