Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3470780 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3470780



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 125
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.02.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
09.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
29.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
29.10.2018 Description Search / examination 27
29.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 8
29.10.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
14.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
14.12.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 24