Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3470780


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
04.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
18.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
21.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
30.10.2018 Amendment by applicant
29.10.2018 Change - representative
29.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
19.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication