Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470780

EP3470780 - OBJECT DISTANCE DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd.
2520 Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SASAMOTO, Manabu
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
02 / NONAKA, Shinichi
c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd.
2520 Takaba
Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17810171.331.05.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP20197
Priority number, dateJP2016011399508.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016113995
[2019/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212992
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470780
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01C3/06, G06T1/00, G06T7/60
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER OBJEKTENTFERNUNG[2019/16]
English:OBJECT DISTANCE DETECTION DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE DISTANCE D'OBJET[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2018Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
29.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2008304202  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0009], [0014] to [0016], [0021] to [0035], [0040] to [0051]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) * [Y] 4, 6, 9, 10;
 [Y]JP2008309637  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [Y] 4, 9, 10 * , paragraphs [0004], [0006], [0007], [0028] to [0048]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2015230703  (NIDEC ELESYS CORP) [Y] 6 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0048]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2001092968  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 7092015 B1 & EP 1087205 A2 & DE 60033751 D *;
 [A]JP2005062910  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2004/0032971 A1 *;
 [A]US8743202  (SCHICK JENS [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * , WHOLE DOCUMENTS & US 2008/0199069 A1 & WO 2006/069854 A1 & EP 1831718 A1 & DE 102004061998 A & CN 101088027 A *
by applicantJP2013174494