Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3467340

EP3467340 - VIBRATION-DAMPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKAKURA, Tomoki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17810227.302.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017JP20657
Priority number, dateJP2016011383807.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016113838
[2019/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017213049
Date:14.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3467340
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:F16F15/08, B60K5/12, F16F1/36
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:VIBRATION-DAMPING DEVICE[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT DE VIBRATIONS[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase01.11.2018Translation filed 
01.11.2018National basic fee paid 
01.11.2018Search fee paid 
01.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
01.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
01.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
30.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US6199841  (DANDRE JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US2006043656  (SHIMIZU YORISHIGE [JP]) [X] 1-6 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US2015129742  (OKANAKA TAKEHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * figure 3 *
International search[X]JP2015169263  (KURASHIKI KAKO, et al) [X] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0037], [0042] to [0046], [0060] to [0061], [0073] to [0075]; fig. 1 to 8, 11 & US 2015/0252871 A1 paragraphs [0064], [0069] to [0073], [0087] to [0088], [0100] to [0102]; fig. 1 to 8, 11 & CN 104890491 A *;
 [A]JP2014163487  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0014], [0021] to [0022]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *;
 [A]US7055811  (IHARA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * , column 5, line 11 to column 6, line 14; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *