Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3467340


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.10.2019 Amendment by applicant
09.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
28.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
09.03.2019 Supplementary search report published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
08.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
05.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
30.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
06.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2018 Change - representative
02.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
02.11.2018 Amendment by applicant
21.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication